SD SB42 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Signed by the Governor on March 5, 2018 S.J. 708
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Signed by the Governor on March 5, 2018 S.J. 708
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the issuance of a motor vehicle title.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the issuance of a motor vehicle title.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 5, 2018 S.J. 708 |
2018-02-27 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 27, 2018 S.J. 612 |
2018-02-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 611 |
2018-02-23 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 588 |
2018-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 527 |
2018-02-20 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-02-20 | House | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 485 |
2018-02-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-19 | House | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 115 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 137 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 114 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-09 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 20 |