SD SB41 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 23, 2020 S.J. 558
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 23, 2020 S.J. 558
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the Board of Regents to contract for the construction of a facilities building at the University of South Dakota and to make an appropriation therefor.
Title
Authorize the Board of Regents to contract for the construction of a facilities building at the University of South Dakota and to make an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 53 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 23, 2020 S.J. 558 |
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 12, 2020 S.J. 522 |
2020-03-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 583 |
2020-03-10 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 475 |
2020-03-09 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 53, NAYS 13. H.J. 531 |
2020-03-05 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 497 |
2020-03-04 | House | First read in House and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 471 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 4. S.J. 403 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 1. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations S.J. 17 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | First Reading Senate S.J. 14 |