SD SB40 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2020 S.J. 558
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorize the Board of Regents to contract for the construction of an Allied Health Facility and the demolition of Julian Hall and the Julian Hall Addition to the University of South Dakota, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize the Board of Regents to contract for the construction of an Allied Health Facility and the demolition of Julian Hall and the Julian Hall Addition to the University of South Dakota, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 51 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 44 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House of Representatives Reconsidered (Y: 45 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 44 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HouseSigned by the Governor on March 27, 2020 S.J. 558
2020-03-12HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 12, 2020 S.J. 552
2020-03-12HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 618
2020-03-12HouseSigned by the President S.J. 541
2020-03-12HouseSenate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 2. S.J. 537
2020-03-12HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 51, NAYS 16. H.J. 602
2020-03-12HouseSenate Conference Committee appointments S.J. 530
2020-03-10HouseHouse of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 546
2020-03-10HouseSenate Conference Committee appointments S.J. 479
2020-03-10HouseSenate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 479
2020-03-09HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 44, NAYS 23. H.J. 532
2020-03-09HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 534 Amendment 40E
2020-03-09HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 520 Amendment 40D
2020-03-09HouseHouse of Representatives Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 45, NAYS 22. H.J. 530
2020-03-09HouseIntent to reconsider H.J. 516
2020-03-09HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 44, NAYS 23. H.J. 516
2020-03-05HouseFirst read in House and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 488
2020-03-04SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 3. S.J. 417
2020-03-02SenateJoint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 4.
2020-03-02SenateJoint Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 40C
2020-03-02SenateJoint Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 40B
2020-03-02SenateJoint Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 40A
2020-03-02SenateScheduled for hearing
2020-01-15SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Appropriations S.J. 17
2020-01-14SenateFirst Reading Senate S.J. 14

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=40&Session=2020
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/62021.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/69142.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/69851.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/70001.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/70007.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=34078&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=34377&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=34617&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=34638&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=34639&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=34913&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=34925&Session=2020

Bill Comments

feedback