SD SB40 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-08 - Signed by Governor S.J. 644
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-08 - Signed by Governor S.J. 644
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide that the uniform administration of certain state taxes apply to the telecommunications gross receipts tax and to limit the application of the uniform administration of certain state taxes.
Title
Provide that the uniform administration of certain state taxes apply to the telecommunications gross receipts tax and to limit the application of the uniform administration of certain state taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-08 | Signed by Governor S.J. 644 | |
2011-02-28 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 548 | |
2011-02-24 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 526 | |
2011-02-23 | Signed by President S.J. 515 | |
2011-02-22 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 465 | |
2011-02-17 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2011-02-17 | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 440 | |
2011-02-17 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-25 | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 174 | |
2011-01-24 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 185 | |
2011-01-21 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 168 | |
2011-01-19 | Taxation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 141 | |
2011-01-19 | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 40oa | |
2011-01-19 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-11 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 22 |