SD SB39 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 23, 2020 S.J. 558
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 23, 2020 S.J. 558
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish the Jobs for South Dakota's Graduates program and the special donation fund.
Title
Establish the Jobs for South Dakota's Graduates program and the special donation fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 60 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 23, 2020 S.J. 558 |
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 12, 2020 S.J. 522 |
2020-03-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 583 |
2020-03-10 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 475 |
2020-03-09 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 7. H.J. 509 |
2020-03-05 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 497 |
2020-03-04 | House | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. |
2020-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to House Education H.J. 118 |
2020-01-29 | House | First Reading House H.J. 85 |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 101 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 90 |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 73 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Education S.J. 17 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | First Reading Senate S.J. 14 |