SD SB39 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 7, 2016 S.J. 538
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 7, 2016 S.J. 538
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions concerning fees for sponsored captive insurance companies.
Title
Revise certain provisions concerning fees for sponsored captive insurance companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 7, 2016 S.J. 538 |
2016-03-02 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 02, 2016 S.J. 500 |
2016-03-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 744 |
2016-02-29 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 481 |
2016-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 0. H.J. 701 |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-02-24 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 658 |
2016-02-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-20 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 69 |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 60 |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 54 |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 44 |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 21 |