SD SB39 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Signed by Governor S.J. 640
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-01 - Signed by Governor S.J. 640
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expand the definition of victim for the purposes of certain written victim impact statements.
Title
Expand the definition of victim for the purposes of certain written victim impact statements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Signed by Governor S.J. 640 | |
2012-02-23 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 533 | |
2012-02-22 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 559 | |
2012-02-21 | Signed by President S.J. 491 | |
2012-02-16 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 1. H.J. 509 | |
2012-02-15 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-02-15 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 481 | |
2012-02-15 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-26 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 225 | |
2012-01-25 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 178 | |
2012-01-24 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-01-24 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 154 | |
2012-01-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-19 | Deferred by Chair | |
2012-01-19 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-10 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 20 |