SD SB39 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 706
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Signed by Governor S.J. 706
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding what organizations qualify for an exemption from sales tax as a relief agency or a religious educational institution.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding what organizations qualify for an exemption from sales tax as a relief agency or a religious educational institution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 54 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 54 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Signed by Governor S.J. 706 | |
2011-03-07 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 622 | |
2011-03-03 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 621 | |
2011-03-02 | Signed by President S.J. 599 | |
2011-02-28 | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 549 | |
2011-02-24 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 54, NAYS 15. H.J. 519 | |
2011-02-23 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 504 | |
2011-02-22 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 483 | |
2011-02-17 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 454 | |
2011-02-16 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 433 | |
2011-02-15 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 403 | |
2011-02-14 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 384 | |
2011-02-10 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 359 | |
2011-02-08 | Taxation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 3. H.J. 312 | |
2011-02-08 | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 39fb | |
2011-02-08 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-01 | Deferred by Chair | |
2011-02-01 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-21 | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 131 | |
2011-01-20 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 151 | |
2011-01-19 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2011-01-19 | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 140 | |
2011-01-19 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-11 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 22 |