SD SB38 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Signed by the Governor on February 10, 2021 S.J. 232
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Signed by the Governor on February 10, 2021 S.J. 232
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Correct technical errors in and make stylistic revisions to certain provisions regarding public utilities.
Title
Correct technical errors in and make stylistic revisions to certain provisions regarding public utilities.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-02-02 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House State Affairs: Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy: Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House State Affairs: Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy: Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 10, 2021 S.J. 232 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 05, 2021 S.J. 199 |
2021-02-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 218 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 174 |
2021-02-02 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 180 |
2021-02-01 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2021-02-01 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2021-02-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 120 |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 96 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 12 |