SD SB38 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2020 S.J. 558
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2020 S.J. 558
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the General Appropriations Act for fiscal year 2020.
Title
Revise the General Appropriations Act for fiscal year 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 53 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 53 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 16 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2020 S.J. 558 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 552 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 12, 2020 S.J. 552 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 620 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 2. S.J. 550 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar, Passed S.J. 550 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 53, NAYS 13. H.J. 619 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Placed on calendar, Passed H.J. 619 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 16, NAYS 2. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Joint Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 38E |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations S.J. 17 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | First Reading Senate S.J. 14 |