SD SB37 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Signed by the Governor on Febrary 14, 2019 S.J. 396
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding association health plans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding association health plans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19HouseSigned by the Governor on Febrary 14, 2019 S.J. 396
2019-02-12HouseDelivered to the Governor on February 12, 2019 S.J. 343
2019-02-11HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 363
2019-02-08HouseSigned by the President S.J. 320
2019-02-07HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 334
2019-02-06HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 306
2019-02-06HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 207
2019-01-24SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 172
2019-01-23SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 158
2019-01-17SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 119
2019-01-17SenateCommerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 37cb
2019-01-17SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 28

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback