SD SB37 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-12 - Signed by Governor S.J. 368
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-12 - Signed by Governor S.J. 368
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the insurance fraud prevention unit.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the insurance fraud prevention unit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-12 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 368 |
2013-02-05 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 320 |
2013-02-04 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 293 |
2013-01-31 | House | Signed by President S.J. 297 |
2013-01-30 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 259 |
2013-01-29 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 243 |
2013-01-28 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 224 |
2013-01-25 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 198 |
2013-01-24 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 175 |
2013-01-23 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 148 |
2013-01-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-17 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 98 |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 117 |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 108 |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-09 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 30 |