SD SB36 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2020 S.J. 558
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2020 S.J. 558
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Transfer funds from the budget reserve fund and to declare an emergency.
Title
Transfer funds from the budget reserve fund and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 50 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2020 S.J. 558 |
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 12, 2020 S.J. 522 |
2020-03-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 583 |
2020-03-10 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 475 |
2020-03-09 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 50, NAYS 16. H.J. 525 |
2020-03-05 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 1. |
2020-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 423 |
2020-02-26 | House | First Reading House H.J. 409 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 341 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 36A |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 17 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | First Reading Senate S.J. 14 |