SD SB36 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-09 - Signed by the Governor on March 8, 2017 S.J. 692
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-09 - Signed by the Governor on March 8, 2017 S.J. 692
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the time to file certain tax returns and remit certain taxes.
Title
Revise the time to file certain tax returns and remit certain taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 60 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House Taxation Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 8, 2017 S.J. 692 |
2017-03-07 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 07, 2017 S.J. 654 |
2017-03-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 675 |
2017-02-28 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 591 |
2017-02-27 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 7. H.J. 555 |
2017-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 539 |
2017-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 521 |
2017-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 477 |
2017-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 438 |
2017-02-16 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 421 |
2017-02-15 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 410 |
2017-02-14 | House | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 4. H.J. 382 |
2017-02-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-08 | House | First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 343 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 4. S.J. 330 |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Taxation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 286 |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 36fb |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Taxation Deferred to another day, Passed |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-10 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 22 |