SD SB35 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2020 S.J. 558
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise the appropriation for the State Veterans' Cemetery and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise the appropriation for the State Veterans' Cemetery and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans Affairs Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HouseSigned by the Governor on March 27, 2020 S.J. 558
2020-03-12HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 12, 2020 S.J. 522
2020-03-11HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 581
2020-03-10HouseSigned by the President S.J. 475
2020-03-09HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 509
2020-03-05HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 495
2020-03-04HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0.
2020-03-04HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-02-27HouseReferred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 420
2020-02-13HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 277
2020-02-12SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 214
2020-02-10SenateMilitary and Veterans Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0.
2020-02-10SenateScheduled for hearing
2020-01-15SenateReferred to Senate Military and Veterans Affairs S.J. 17
2020-01-14SenateFirst Reading Senate S.J. 14

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback