SD SB35 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-07 - Signed by Governor S.J. 713
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-07 - Signed by Governor S.J. 713
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allow the prosecution to appeal from certain judgments of acquittal.
Title
Allow the prosecution to appeal from certain judgments of acquittal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 713 |
2013-03-04 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 634 |
2013-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 598 |
2013-02-26 | House | Signed by President S.J. 586 |
2013-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 4. H.J. 531 |
2013-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 507 |
2013-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 491 |
2013-02-20 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 451 |
2013-02-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-22 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 136 |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 149 |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 122 |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-09 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 29 |