SD SB34 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - Signed by the Governor on February 26, 2020 S.J. 363
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establish a qualified benefit preservation arrangement for eligible members of the South Dakota Retirement System.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish a qualified benefit preservation arrangement for eligible members of the South Dakota Retirement System.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Certified uncontested (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-12 - House - House Retirement Laws Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Retirement Laws Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27HouseSigned by the Governor on February 26, 2020 S.J. 363
2020-02-21HouseDelivered to the Governor on February 21, 2020 S.J. 302
2020-02-20HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 338
2020-02-19HouseSigned by the President S.J. 259
2020-02-18HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 297
2020-02-12HouseCertified uncontested, placed on consent, YEAS 5, NAYS 0.
2020-02-12HouseRetirement Laws Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0.
2020-02-12HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-01-28HouseReferred to House Retirement Laws H.J. 75
2020-01-27HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 62
2020-01-24SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 77
2020-01-22SenateRetirement Laws Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0.
2020-01-22SenateScheduled for hearing
2020-01-15SenateReferred to Senate Retirement Laws S.J. 17
2020-01-14SenateFirst Reading Senate S.J. 14

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback