SD SB34 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by the Governor on March 7, 2019 S.J. 672
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Make an appropriation for the replacement of the Elm Lake Dam spillway and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Make an appropriation for the replacement of the Elm Lake Dam spillway and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11HouseSigned by the Governor on March 7, 2019 S.J. 672
2019-03-05HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 05, 2019
2019-03-04HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 622
2019-02-28HouseSigned by the President S.J. 556
2019-02-21HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 464
2019-02-20HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 453
2019-02-19HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 443
2019-02-14HouseFirst read in House and committee referral waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 416
2019-02-13SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 370
2019-01-28SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 198
2019-01-25SenateJoint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 17, NAYS 0. S.J. 179
2019-01-25SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations S.J. 27

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback