SD SB34 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Signed by the Governor on February 27, 2018 S.J. 608
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Signed by the Governor on February 27, 2018 S.J. 608
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding registration for pesticide products.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding registration for pesticide products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 27, 2018 S.J. 608 |
2018-02-22 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 22, 2018 S.J. 548 |
2018-02-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 540 |
2018-02-20 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 513 |
2018-02-12 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 407 |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2018-02-08 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 386 |
2018-02-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 207 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 232 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 192 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-09 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 18 |