SD SB3 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. S.J. 459
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. S.J. 459
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increase the amount of unobligated cash that may be transferred to the building South Dakota fund after the end of a fiscal year.
Title
Increase the amount of unobligated cash that may be transferred to the building South Dakota fund after the end of a fiscal year.
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Maher [R] | Sen. Terri Haverly [R] | Rep. David Lust [R] | Rep. Roger Chase [R] |
Sen. Kyle Schoenfish [R] | Rep. Jamie Smith [D] | Rep. Charles Turbiville [R] | Sen. Susan Wismer [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Tabled (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. S.J. 459 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations, Passed S.J. 269 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed S.J. 196 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations, Passed S.J. 116 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 12 |