SD SB3 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Signed by Governor S.J. 736
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Signed by Governor S.J. 736
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for mediation of certain drainage disputes.
Title
Provide for mediation of certain drainage disputes.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Vehle [R] | Sen. Jason Frerichs [D] | Sen. Jim White [R] | Rep. Brian Gosch [R] |
Rep. Dennis Feickert [D] | Rep. Spencer Hawley [D] | Rep. Leslie Heinemann [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 736 |
2015-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 646 |
2015-03-09 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 670 |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by President S.J. 628 |
2015-03-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 617 |
2015-03-04 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 600 |
2015-03-03 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 563 |
2015-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-26 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 539 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 2. S.J. 517 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 499 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 480 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 449 |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 407 |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. Amendment 3fa |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-13 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 16 |