SD SB3 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor S.J. 756
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor S.J. 756
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Require the reporting of the outcomes of certain licensure and certification examinations.
Title
Require the reporting of the outcomes of certain licensure and certification examinations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 61 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 756 |
2013-03-04 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 634 |
2013-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 598 |
2013-02-26 | House | Signed by President S.J. 586 |
2013-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 7. H.J. 530 |
2013-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 507 |
2013-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 491 |
2013-02-20 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 449 |
2013-02-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-24 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 170 |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 189 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 157 |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 123 |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 3ca |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-09 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 23 |