SD SB29 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-09 - Signed by the Governor on February 09, 2022 S.J. 219
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-09 - Signed by the Governor on February 09, 2022 S.J. 219
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize highway maintenance vehicles to operate at less than the posted minimum speed on interstate highways.
Title
Authorize highway maintenance vehicles to operate at less than the posted minimum speed on interstate highways.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-01-26 - House - Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-14 - Senate - Certified uncontested, placed on consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-14 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-14 - Senate - Certified uncontested, placed on consent (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-14 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on February 09, 2022 S.J. 219 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on February 02, 2022 S.J. 158 |
2022-02-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 172 |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 143 |
2022-01-26 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 130 |
2022-01-25 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed |
2022-01-25 | House | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. |
2022-01-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-01-19 | House | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 41 |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 66 |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 1 |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 1 |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2022-01-11 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 17 |