SD SB29 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 770
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 770
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increase the amount authorized for certain brand fees and to authorize an expedited registration fee.
Title
Increase the amount authorized for certain brand fees and to authorize an expedited registration fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 770 |
2018-03-08 | House | Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 761 Amendment cc29a |
2018-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 1. H.J. 757 |
2018-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 752 Amendment Cc29a |
2018-03-07 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 735 |
2018-03-07 | House | Senate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 740 |
2018-03-06 | House | House of Representatives Title amended, Passed H.J. 709 Amendment 29fta |
2018-03-06 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 7. H.J. 708 |
2018-03-01 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 664 |
2018-03-01 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 29ab |
2018-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-13 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 420 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 6. S.J. 436 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 413 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations, Passed S.J. 269 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations S.J. 17 |