SD SB28 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Signed by the Governor on March 02, 2020 S.J. 395
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Signed by the Governor on March 02, 2020 S.J. 395
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal provisions regarding the restricted real estate broker's license for auctioneers and to revise certain provisions regarding real estate licensing.
Title
Repeal provisions regarding the restricted real estate broker's license for auctioneers and to revise certain provisions regarding real estate licensing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 02, 2020 S.J. 395 |
2020-02-26 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 26, 2020 S.J. 352 |
2020-02-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 392 |
2020-02-24 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 327 |
2020-02-21 | House | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 304 |
2020-02-19 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 1. H.J. 323 |
2020-02-19 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 321 Amendment 28B |
2020-02-18 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 304 |
2020-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 283 |
2020-02-11 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 263 |
2020-02-10 | House | Remove from Consent Calendar H.J. 243 |
2020-02-07 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-02-07 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 77 |
2020-01-27 | House | First Reading House H.J. 64 |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 76 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-14 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 11 |