SD SB28 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - Signed by the Governor on February 8, 2018 S.J. 428
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - Signed by the Governor on February 8, 2018 S.J. 428
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation for costs related to suppression of wildfires in the state and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation for costs related to suppression of wildfires in the state and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Do Pass, Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Do Pass, Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 8, 2018 S.J. 428 |
2018-02-06 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 06, 2018 S.J. 383 |
2018-02-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 347 |
2018-02-02 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 358 |
2018-02-01 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 1. H.J. 299 |
2018-01-31 | House | First read in House and committee referral waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 253 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 276 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 16, NAYS 0. S.J. 239 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-09 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations S.J. 17 |