SD SB27 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 35, NAYS 34. H.J. 395
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 35, NAYS 34. H.J. 395
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise disciplinary action remedies of the Cosmetology Commission.
Title
Revise disciplinary action remedies of the Cosmetology Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-09 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 35, NAYS 34. H.J. 395 | |
2012-02-08 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4. H.J. 355 | |
2012-02-08 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-20 | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 71 | |
2012-01-19 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 3. S.J. 84 | |
2012-01-13 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 71 | |
2012-01-12 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 50 | |
2012-01-12 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-10 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 18 |