SD SB27 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-08 - Signed by Governor S.J. 644
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-08 - Signed by Governor S.J. 644
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions relating to the State Electrical Commission.
Title
Revise certain provisions relating to the State Electrical Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-08 | Signed by Governor S.J. 644 | |
2011-03-01 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 568 | |
2011-02-28 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 563 | |
2011-02-25 | Signed by President S.J. 542 | |
2011-02-24 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 521 | |
2011-02-23 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 504 | |
2011-02-22 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 483 | |
2011-02-17 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 454 | |
2011-02-16 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 433 | |
2011-02-15 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 403 | |
2011-02-14 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 366 | |
2011-02-14 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-25 | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 173 | |
2011-01-24 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 183 | |
2011-01-21 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 168 | |
2011-01-20 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 148 | |
2011-01-20 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-11 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 20 |