SD SB26 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 18, 2020 S.J. 557
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 18, 2020 S.J. 557
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increase the assessment of liquidated court costs and to revise the disposition of the funds collected.
Title
Increase the assessment of liquidated court costs and to revise the disposition of the funds collected.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Reconsidered (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Reconsidered (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 18, 2020 S.J. 557 |
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 12, 2020 S.J. 540 |
2020-03-12 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 620 |
2020-03-12 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 524 |
2020-03-11 | House | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 6. S.J. 489 |
2020-03-09 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 5. H.J. 510 |
2020-03-09 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 509 Amendment 26G |
2020-03-05 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 497 |
2020-03-04 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. |
2020-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 433 |
2020-02-13 | House | First Reading House H.J. 279 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 3. S.J. 209 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 208 Amendment 26E |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 188 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 174 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 153 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 4. S.J. 152 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Intent to reconsider S.J. 144 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 19, NAYS 14. S.J. 144 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 131 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 115 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 90 |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 73 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 67 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 60 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-14 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 11 |