SD SB25 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 18, 2020 S.J. 557
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establish certain requirements to maintain state compliance with the Master Settlement Agreement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish certain requirements to maintain state compliance with the Master Settlement Agreement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HouseSigned by the Governor on March 18, 2020 S.J. 557
2020-03-12HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 12, 2020 S.J. 522
2020-03-11HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 583
2020-03-10HouseSigned by the President S.J. 475
2020-03-09HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 508
2020-03-04HouseCertified uncontested, placed on consent
2020-03-04HouseJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0.
2020-03-04HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-01-24HouseReferred to House Judiciary H.J. 59
2020-01-22HouseFirst read in House and referred to committee assignment waived. H.J. 44
2020-01-21SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 57
2020-01-17SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 46
2020-01-16SenateCertified uncontested, placed on consent
2020-01-16SenateJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0.
2020-01-16SenateScheduled for hearing
2020-01-14SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 11

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback