SD SB25 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2016 S.J. 603
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2016 S.J. 603
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions concerning forfeiture of property interests of persons convicted of certain crimes.
Title
Revise certain provisions concerning forfeiture of property interests of persons convicted of certain crimes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2016 S.J. 603 |
2016-03-08 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 08, 2016 S.J. 560 |
2016-03-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 807 |
2016-03-03 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 534 |
2016-03-01 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 737 |
2016-02-29 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-02-29 | House | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 712 |
2016-02-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-03 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 262 |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 185 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 158 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 19 |