SD SB25 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor S.J. 714
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor S.J. 714
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the Board of Regents to enter into a lease-purchase agreement to acquire agricultural property in Moody County for the use and benefit of the South Dakota State University Agricultural Experiment Station.
Title
Authorize the Board of Regents to enter into a lease-purchase agreement to acquire agricultural property in Moody County for the use and benefit of the South Dakota State University Agricultural Experiment Station.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 714 |
2015-03-09 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 632 |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 644 |
2015-03-05 | House | Signed by President S.J. 613 |
2015-03-04 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 2. H.J. 591 |
2015-03-03 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 581 |
2015-02-27 | House | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 552 |
2015-02-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-04 | House | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 286 |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 270 |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 242 |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-13 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 20 |