SD SB24 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 6. H.J. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Allow a change of voter registration information through an online system provided by the Office of the Secretary of State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allow a change of voter registration information through an online system provided by the Office of the Secretary of State.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-03-01 - House - House State Affairs: Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House State Affairs: Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate State Affairs: Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate State Affairs: Motion to amend (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01HouseState Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 6. H.J. 1
2021-03-01HouseState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 6, NAYS 7. H.J. 1
2021-03-01HouseState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 1 Amendment 24F
2021-03-01HouseScheduled for hearing H.J. 1
2021-02-25HouseReferred to House State Affairs H.J. 400
2021-01-27HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 140
2021-01-26SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 21, NAYS 13. S.J. 118
2021-01-26SenateSenate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 117 Amendment 24E
2021-01-22SenateState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1.
2021-01-22SenateState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. Amendment 24A
2021-01-22SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-01-12SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 16

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback