SD SB24 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor S.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions relating to pseudoephedrine, ephedrine, or phenylpropanolamine sales.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions relating to pseudoephedrine, ephedrine, or phenylpropanolamine sales.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Motion to amend (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-31HouseSigned by Governor S.J. 688
2014-03-11HouseDelivered to the Governor S.J. 617
2014-03-10HouseSigned by Speaker H.J. 695
2014-03-06HouseSigned by President S.J. 575
2014-03-05HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 2. H.J. 651
2014-03-04HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2014-03-04HouseHealth and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 625
2014-03-04HouseScheduled for hearing
2014-02-26HouseReferred to House Health and Human Services, Passed H.J. 567
2014-01-29HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 158
2014-01-28SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 138
2014-01-23SenateJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 95
2014-01-23SenateJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. Amendment 24ra
2014-01-23SenateScheduled for hearing
2014-01-14SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 17

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback