SD SB239 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-08 - Signed by Governor S.J. 738
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-08 - Signed by Governor S.J. 738
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal the state's membership in the multistate tax commission.
Title
Repeal the state's membership in the multistate tax commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 55 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-08 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 738 |
2013-03-04 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 634 |
2013-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 598 |
2013-02-26 | House | Signed by President S.J. 586 |
2013-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 55, NAYS 13. H.J. 528 |
2013-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 507 |
2013-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 491 |
2013-02-20 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 472 |
2013-02-19 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 443 |
2013-02-15 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 425 |
2013-02-14 | House | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. H.J. 378 |
2013-02-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-13 | House | Appropriations Deferred to another day, Passed |
2013-02-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-06 | House | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 326 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 329 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 316 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 286 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 246 |