SD SB238 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-04 - Scheduled for hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-04 - Scheduled for hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate money to the animal damage control fund for predator control services and to declare an emergency.
Title
Appropriate money to the animal damage control fund for predator control services and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-03-04 | House | Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. H.J. 688 |
2013-02-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-25 | House | Deferred by Chair |
2013-02-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-21 | House | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 482 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 8. S.J. 490 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 490 Amendment 238fa |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 445 |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 434 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 409 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 245 |