SD SB235 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor S.J. 757
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor S.J. 757
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Create the building South Dakota fund and certain other funds and programs to enhance economic development and education, to make certain deposits and transfers, to make continuous appropriations, to revise certain education funding to support economic development, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Create the building South Dakota fund and certain other funds and programs to enhance economic development and education, to make certain deposits and transfers, to make continuous appropriations, to revise certain education funding to support economic development, to make an appropriation therefor, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Corey Brown [R] | Sen. Timothy Rave [R] | Sen. Justin Cronin [R] | Rep. Kristin Conzet [R] |
Rep. Christine Erickson [R] | Rep. Brian Gosch [R] | Rep. David Lust [R] | Sen. Dean Wink [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 60 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 56 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 60 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 56 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 757 |
2013-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 838 |
2013-03-08 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 754 |
2013-03-08 | House | Signed by President S.J. 745 |
2013-03-07 | House | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 2. S.J. 734 |
2013-03-07 | House | Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 714 Amendment cc235A |
2013-03-07 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 6. H.J. 812 |
2013-03-07 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 796 Amendment Cc235A |
2013-03-06 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 765 |
2013-03-06 | House | Senate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 697 |
2013-03-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 56, NAYS 13. H.J. 722 |
2013-03-04 | House | State Affairs Title amended, Passed Amendment 235fta |
2013-03-04 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 613 |
2013-03-04 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 235fa |
2013-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-21 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 481 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 3. S.J. 450 |
2013-02-15 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 425 |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 245 |