SD SB233 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-8)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor S.J. 757
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-8)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor S.J. 757
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Create the critical teaching needs scholarship program, to make an appropriation to the education enhancement trust fund to provide for the annual funding of the scholarships, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Create the critical teaching needs scholarship program, to make an appropriation to the education enhancement trust fund to provide for the annual funding of the scholarships, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 51 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Referred to House Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Education Referred as Amended to Senate Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 51 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Referred to House Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Education Referred as Amended to Senate Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 757 |
2013-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 838 |
2013-03-08 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 754 |
2013-03-08 | House | Signed by President S.J. 745 |
2013-03-07 | House | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 723 |
2013-03-05 | House | House of Representatives Title amended, Passed H.J. 730 Amendment 233mtb |
2013-03-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 51, NAYS 18. H.J. 729 |
2013-03-05 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 729 Amendment 233mb |
2013-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-03-04 | House | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. H.J. 686 |
2013-03-04 | House | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 233ma |
2013-02-27 | House | Referred to House Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 3. H.J. 567 |
2013-02-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-21 | House | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 481 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 4. S.J. 503 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 464 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 233da |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Education Title amended, Passed Amendment 233cta |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Education Referred as Amended to Senate Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 321 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 233cb |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 244 |