SD SB23 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-08 - Signed by Governor S.J. 644
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-08 - Signed by Governor S.J. 644
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Update certain citations to federal regulations regarding pipeline safety inspection.
Title
Update certain citations to federal regulations regarding pipeline safety inspection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-08 | Signed by Governor S.J. 644 | |
2011-03-01 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 568 | |
2011-02-28 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 563 | |
2011-02-25 | Signed by President S.J. 542 | |
2011-02-24 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 517 | |
2011-02-23 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2011-02-23 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 489 | |
2011-02-23 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-24 | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 150 | |
2011-01-21 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 167 | |
2011-01-20 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2011-01-20 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 148 | |
2011-01-20 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-11 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 19 |