SD SB22 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2020 S.J. 473
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2020 S.J. 473
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To revise certain provisions regarding pesticide registration, pesticide application, and enforcement of pesticide laws.
Title
To revise certain provisions regarding pesticide registration, pesticide application, and enforcement of pesticide laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2020 S.J. 473 |
2020-03-05 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 05, 2020 S.J. 433 |
2020-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 477 |
2020-03-03 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 405 |
2020-03-02 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 2. H.J. 443 |
2020-02-27 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-28 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 76 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 2. S.J. 92 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. Amendment 22C |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 22A |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 22E |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-14 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 12 |