SD SB22 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Signed by the Governor on February 19, 2019 S.J. 396
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Signed by the Governor on February 19, 2019 S.J. 396
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Place certain substances on the controlled substances schedule and to declare an emergency.
Title
Place certain substances on the controlled substances schedule and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 19, 2019 S.J. 396 |
2019-02-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 12, 2019 S.J. 343 |
2019-02-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 363 |
2019-02-08 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 320 |
2019-02-07 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 1. H.J. 331 |
2019-02-06 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar H.J. 308 |
2019-02-05 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-02-05 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2019-02-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-28 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 221 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 192 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 150 |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 22kd |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-08 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 25 |
Subjects
Controlled Substances
Crimes
Drugs
Emergency Clause
Public Health and Safety
Public Officers and Employees
Crimes
Drugs
Emergency Clause
Public Health and Safety
Public Officers and Employees