SD SB22 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Signed by the Governor on February 19, 2019 S.J. 396
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Place certain substances on the controlled substances schedule and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Place certain substances on the controlled substances schedule and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19HouseSigned by the Governor on February 19, 2019 S.J. 396
2019-02-12HouseDelivered to the Governor on February 12, 2019 S.J. 343
2019-02-11HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 363
2019-02-08HouseSigned by the President S.J. 320
2019-02-07HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 1. H.J. 331
2019-02-06HouseRemoved from Consent Calendar H.J. 308
2019-02-05HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2019-02-05HouseHealth and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0.
2019-02-05HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-28HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 221
2019-01-25SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 192
2019-01-23SenateHealth and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 150
2019-01-23SenateHealth and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 22kd
2019-01-23SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-14SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 25

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback