SD SB217 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-19 - Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 477
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-19 - Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 477
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempt certain rodeo events from sales taxes.
Title
Exempt certain rodeo events from sales taxes.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Bradford [D] | Sen. Angie Buhl [D] | Sen. Ryan Maher [R] | Sen. Billie Sutton [D] |
Sen. Troy Heinert [D] | Rep. Julie Bartling [D] | Rep. Peggy Gibson [D] | Rep. Elizabeth May [R] |
Rep. Dean Schrempp [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Appropriations Tabled (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Taxation Deferred to another day (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Taxation Deferred to another day (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-19 | Senate | Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 477 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Appropriations Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 3, NAYS 4. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Re-referred to Senate Appropriations, Passed S.J. 413 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Taxation Deferred to another day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 241 |