SD SB210 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Agriculture and Natural Resources Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. S.J. 546
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Agriculture and Natural Resources Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. S.J. 546
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transfer certain funds from the ethanol fuel fund to the ethanol infrastructure incentive fund.
Title
Transfer certain funds from the ethanol fuel fund to the ethanol infrastructure incentive fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Frerichs [D] | Sen. Jordan Youngberg [R] | Rep. Dan Ahlers [D] | Rep. Julie Bartling [D] |
Rep. Oren Lesmeister [D] | Rep. John Mills [R] | Rep. Kent Peterson [R] | Rep. Lee Qualm [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. S.J. 546 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 210fc |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Deferred by Chair |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 329 |