SD SB21 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - Signed by the Governor on February 8, 2018 S.J. 428
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Update references to certain federal motor carrier regulations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Update references to certain federal motor carrier regulations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-31 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 60 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 60 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-12HouseSigned by the Governor on February 8, 2018 S.J. 428
2018-02-06HouseDelivered to the Governor on February 06, 2018 S.J. 383
2018-02-05HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 347
2018-02-01HouseSigned by the President S.J. 338
2018-01-31HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 6. H.J. 266
2018-01-30HouseTransportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 219
2018-01-30HouseScheduled for hearing
2018-01-17HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 78
2018-01-16SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 6. S.J. 100
2018-01-12SenateTransportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 62
2018-01-12SenateScheduled for hearing
2018-01-09SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 16

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=21&Session=2018
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/SB21P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2018/Bills/SB21ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24447&Session=2018&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24507&Session=2018&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24999&Session=2018&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=25114&Session=2018&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24447&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24507&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=24999&Session=2018
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=25114&Session=2018

Bill Comments

feedback