SD SB21 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor S.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Signed by Governor S.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the collection and setting of 24/7 sobriety program fees and regarding the monitoring of ignition interlock testing.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the collection and setting of 24/7 sobriety program fees and regarding the monitoring of ignition interlock testing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 688 |
2014-03-11 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 617 |
2014-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 695 |
2014-03-06 | House | Signed by President S.J. 575 |
2014-03-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 2. H.J. 651 |
2014-03-04 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2014-03-04 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 625 |
2014-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-26 | House | Referred to House Local Government, Passed H.J. 567 |
2014-01-29 | House | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 158 |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 137 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 94 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 21ra |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 87 |
2014-01-15 | Senate | First read in Senate S.J. 33 |