SD SB21 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-29 - Senate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 267
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-29 - Senate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 267
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminate ownership inspection for horses and mules.
Title
Eliminate ownership inspection for horses and mules.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Tabled (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 267 |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 235 |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 229 |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 197 |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-09 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 27 |