SD SB21 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-25 - Signed by Governor S.J. 532
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-25 - Signed by Governor S.J. 532
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminate the requirement for single action hardware on primary exit doors for specialty resorts and vacation homes.
Title
Eliminate the requirement for single action hardware on primary exit doors for specialty resorts and vacation homes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-25 | Signed by Governor S.J. 532 | |
2011-02-22 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 479 | |
2011-02-17 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 455 | |
2011-02-16 | Signed by President S.J. 457 | |
2011-02-15 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 396 | |
2011-02-14 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2011-02-14 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 366 | |
2011-02-14 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-25 | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 173 | |
2011-01-24 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 179 | |
2011-01-20 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2011-01-20 | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 149 | |
2011-01-20 | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 21ja | |
2011-01-20 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-11 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 19 |