SD SB206 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-5)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor S.J. 757
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-5)
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by Governor S.J. 757
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions relating to liability and to worker's compensation and disability payments for law enforcement officers performing duties in other jurisdictions.
Title
Revise certain provisions relating to liability and to worker's compensation and disability payments for law enforcement officers performing duties in other jurisdictions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 757 |
2013-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 838 |
2013-03-08 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 754 |
2013-03-08 | House | Signed by President S.J. 745 |
2013-03-06 | House | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 699 |
2013-03-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 721 |
2013-02-28 | House | Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. H.J. 613 |
2013-02-28 | House | Local Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 206fa |
2013-02-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-19 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 437 |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 2. S.J. 436 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 402 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 239 |