SD SB205 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 19. S.J. 311
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 19. S.J. 311
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Index a certain level of municipal proceeds regarding the disbursements from the Gaming Commission fund to an inflation index.
Title
Index a certain level of municipal proceeds regarding the disbursements from the Gaming Commission fund to an inflation index.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 16, NAYS 19. S.J. 311 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 311 Amendment 205A |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 293 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Deferred with pending amendment (Rule 5-17), Passed S.J. 262 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. S.J. 1 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate State Affairs, Passed S.J. 199 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed S.J. 172 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 162 |